Somers v. Digital Realty Trust Inc et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Paul Somers
Defendant: Digital Realty Trust Inc and Ellen Jacobs
Case Number: 4:2014cv05180
Filed: November 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re 331 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and 332 Defendants' Motion in Limine. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen partially granting 343 Plaintiff's Second Request for Extension of Time to File Opposition. Plaintiff's opposition is due Monday July 16. No further extensions will be granted. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Discharging 315 Order to Show Cause; Denying 324 Defendants' Motion to Strike. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 271 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions; denying 288 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER Denying 313 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion for Sanctions; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/11/2018. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/27/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER Denying 306 Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time. The hearing on April 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. will go forward as scheduled. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/18/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 280 Motion to Strike. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting 274 Request for Extension of Time to File Opposition; Denying 274 Request to Reopen Discovery. Plaintiff's opposition to 271 Defendants' motion for sanctions is due by 3/6/2018. Defendants' reply is due by 3/13/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 249 253 254 Plaintiff's Requests for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's Discovery Orders. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 242 Motion for Protective Order. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 216 220 Discovery Letter Briefs. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER Regarding May 2017 Discovery Filings by Judge Kandis A. Westmore striking 222 May 3, 2017 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 226 Request to Strike; denying 227 Request for a Hearing; striking 228 Plaintiff's May 16, 2017 Filing; denying in part 229 Ex Parte Application; denying 233 Request for Review; denying as moot 234 Request to Strike; denying 235 Request for a Hearing; denying as moot 236 Request to Strike. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 205 206 207 Sixth Discovery Letter Brief, Seventh Discovery Letter Brief, and Motion to Strike. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 204 FOR TEMPORARY STAY PENDING PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI PROCEEDINGS filed by Digital Realty Trust Inc. Status Report due by 6/15/2017. Status Conference set for 6/22/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER re 198 Defendants' March 23, 2017 Letter. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/24/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 164 Fifth Discovery Letter; Denying 165 Defendants' Motion to Strike Fifth Discovery Letter. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 158 Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [EXPEDITED] TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION TO ALLOW FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL filed by Digital Realty Trust Inc, Ellen Jacobs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/19/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 141 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF PARTIES TO ASSIGNMENT TO COURT-APPOINTED MEDIATOR AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Digital Realty Trust Inc, Ellen Jacobs. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/18/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 128 REQUESTS APPROVAL TO MOVE CMC DATE TO CMC DATE filed by Paul Somers Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for Tuesday 10/18/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/2/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Sustaining in Part and Overruling in Part 111 Plaintiff's Objections to July 8, 2016 Order. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re Supplemental Briefing on 111 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief of 110 Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ALLOWING PAUL SOMERS TO E-FILE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/16/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/22/15. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AMENDED ORDER DENYING 20 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/22/15. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 20 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and Denying 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Defense Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP, Rules 12(b)(6) adn 12(h)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Digital Realty Trust Inc, Ellen Jacobs. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/6/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Hearing Date and Case Management Conference filed by Paul Somers, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Hearing Date and Case Management Conference, 20 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP, Rules 12(b)(6) adn 12(h)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof. Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/13/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 Stipulation filed by Digital Realty Trust Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/22/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Somers v. Digital Realty Trust Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Somers
Represented By: Stephen F. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Realty Trust Inc
Represented By: Brian T. Ashe
Represented By: Daniel Chu Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Jacobs
Represented By: Brian T. Ashe
Represented By: Daniel Chu Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?