Yucesoy v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hakan Yucesoy
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc., Travis Kalanick and Ryan Graves
Case Number: 4:2015cv00262
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 347 Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval and Granting 335 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 321 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 293 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 292 Amended Complaint Briefing Schedule filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Travis Kalanick. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/9/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 206 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER Re 206 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/30/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing on 206 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval 206 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/13/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 204 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER re Objections to Proposed Class Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/2016. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 149 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/29/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 166 Defendant's Motion to Stay. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER re 167 Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to expedite is due January 4, 2016 by 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/31/2015. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2015)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 157 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File Revised Third Amended Complaint filed by Hakan Yucesoy. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Expediting Discovery filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Travis Kalanick. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/20/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER - CORRECTED ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 109 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/10/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 117 Regarding Hearing Schedule For Case Management Conference, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Change Dates of Upcoming Hearings and Modify Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Hakan Yucesoy, S et/Reset Deadlines as to 112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Change Dates of Upcoming Hearings and Modify Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, 109 MOTION to Dismiss < i>Second Amended Class Action Complaint, 94 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration as to Plaintiffs Morris and Sanchez. Responses due by 9/18/2015. Replies due by 10/1/2015. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to change dates for deposition and one-day bench trial filed by Hakan Yucesoy Bench Trial reset for 12/4/2015 09:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Notice of Reference and Order re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/26/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 98 One-Day Bench Trial filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Ryan Graves, Travis Kalanick. Bench Trial on the issue whether Plaintiff formed a contract with Uber is set for 11/23/2015 09:30 AM before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORAL ARGUMENT PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/29/15. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 79 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER--RESPONSE DUE JULY 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/15. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Time for Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Permit Plaintiffs to File a Brief Supplement in Support of Their Opposition filed by Hakan Yucesoy. Responses due by 7/1/2015. Replies due by 7/8/2015.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/30/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Ryan Graves, Travis Kalanick. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/25/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Hakan Yucesoy, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continu e Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, 62 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing reset for 8/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset for 8/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 36 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DEFERRING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/15. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 44 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Ryan Graves, Travis Kalanick. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re Briefing Schedules. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/15. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE; FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/19/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 Stipulation filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Ryan Graves, Travis Kalanick. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yucesoy v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hakan Yucesoy
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Adelaide Pagano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Jon Hendricks
Represented By: Caitlin Victoria May
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Kalanick
Represented By: Robert Jon Hendricks
Represented By: Caitlin Victoria May
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Graves
Represented By: Robert Jon Hendricks
Represented By: Caitlin Victoria May
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?