Rivera v. East Bay Municipal Utility District et al
Plaintiff: Ivette Rivera
Defendant: East Bay Municipal Utility District, Jylana Collins, EBMUD General Council and Maria Lourdes Matthews
Case Number: 4:2015cv00380
Filed: January 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/1/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Saundra B Armstrong denying 122 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 124 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 AMENDED ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION (Correction of date for Defendant(s) to designate experts). Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/25/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge SAUNDRA BROWN ARMSTRONG on 4/21/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016) Modified on 4/21/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong re: 79 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a Third Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date this Order is filed. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadlines to 79 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 1/8/2016. Replies due by 1/15/2016. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/21/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2016. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2016 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/10/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 68 Proposed Order, filed by Frank Mellon, Jill Gaskins, Alexander Coate, Richard Jung, Delores Turner, Lynelle Lewis, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Ted Lam, Mike Wallis, Andy Katz, Michael Rich, William Patterson, Doug Linney, Phil Kohne, Lesa McIntosh, Lourdes Maria Matthew, Jylana Collins, Katy Foulkes, John Coleman. Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2015 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/28/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. East Bay Municipal Utility District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivette Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Bay Municipal Utility District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jylana Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBMUD General Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Lourdes Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?