Cabell v. Zorro Productions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert W Cabell
Defendant: Zorro Productions Inc. and John Gertz
Case Number: 4:2015cv00771
Filed: February 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/18/2018 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 10/8/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/5/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Order of Sua Sponte Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 18-mc-80100-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/26/2018. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER DENYING 237 Motion of Nonparty to Quash Subpoena filed by Non-Party Rickie Roberts. Parties ordered to meet and confer immediately and by no later than 6/20/2018. Ms. Roberts to be deposed on or before 7/3/2018. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 6/18/2018. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER GRANTING 185 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 195 DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/11/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER DENYING 203 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/28/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY): Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 7/12/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 8/7/2018 09:00 AM, Jury Trial set for 8/7/2018 01:30 PM. Jury Trial dates:8/8,8/10,8/14,8/15,8/17,8/21,8/22,8/24 and 8/28/2018(Deliberations) 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/27/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER DENYING 138 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/14/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order re: 140 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2 signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/5/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 120 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. All dismissed claims are dismissed with leave to amend. Any amended complaint shall be filed no later than 6/26/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/30/2017. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 105 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint; denying without prejudice 101 Motion to Dismiss. The court schedules a Case Management Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 11/17/2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 11/10/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/23/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabell v. Zorro Productions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W Cabell
Represented By: Michael G Atkins
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Gregory D Latham
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zorro Productions Inc.
Represented By: David Aronoff
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant
Represented By: Michael D. Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gertz
Represented By: David Aronoff
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant
Represented By: Michael D. Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?