Kihagi v. City of San Francisco

Plaintiff: Anna Kihagi, Xelan Prop 1, LLC, Renka Prop, LLC and Zoriall LLC
Defendant: City of San Francisco, California, Victoria L. Weatherford and Michael Weiss
Case Number: 4:2015cv01168
Filed: March 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 84 85 86 87 Motions to Withdraw; Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/27/2019. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 71 Clerk's Notice. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Anna Kihagi, City of San Francisco, California. Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/4/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 59 Order,,, CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Anna Kihagi, City of San Francisco, California Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/3/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 46 Motion to Lift Stay. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 46 MOTION to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/25/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 43 Order Staying Case, Terminate Motions, Terminate Hearings, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Set Hearings STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Anna Kihagi, City of San Francisco, California Further Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/23/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 19 MOTION TO STAY. Case Management Conference continued to 6/28/2016 at 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 01/15/2016. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Response due within 14 days. Hearing on motion to stay continued to 1/21/2016 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/24/15. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 Brief, 19 MOTION to Stay , 26 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 08/17/2015 filed by Xelan P rop 1, LLC, Anna Kihagi, Renka Prop, LLC, Zoriall LLC, City of San Francisco, California, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 Brief, 19 MOTION to Stay , 26 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Ter minate Deadlines and Hearings,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 08/17/2015, 19 MOTION to Stay . Responses due by 8/17/2015. Replies due by 8/24/2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/14/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 22 Stipulation to Continue Hearing Dates Re: 1. City's Motion to Stay; 2) Initial Case Management Conference. Responses due by 8/13/2015. Replies due by 8/20/2015. Motion Hearing continued to 9/17/2015 at 11:00 AM. Case Management Conference continued to 10/20/2015 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/17/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kihagi v. City of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Kihagi
Represented By: Julie Ngoc Nong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xelan Prop 1, LLC
Represented By: Julie Ngoc Nong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renka Prop, LLC
Represented By: Julie Ngoc Nong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoriall LLC
Represented By: Julie Ngoc Nong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Francisco, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria L. Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?