Evans v. Gilmore et al
Plaintiff: Teralyn Renea Evans
Defendant: Preston Gilmore, Savannah McKenzie, Melissa Connelly, Donna Thoreson, Clarence Johnson, Rodney Harvey, Stan Cooper, Linda Ray, Alicia Wood, Contra Costa County, Mark Gagan, Greg Gibson and City of Richmond
Case Number: 4:2015cv01772
Filed: April 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying as moot 81 Motion to Dismiss. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 60 , 61 Motions for Summary Judgment. Show Cause Response due by 3/9/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/12/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DISCOVERY ORDER re 49 Letter filed by City of Richmond. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/20/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 47 Defendant's request to compel discovery responses. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR CITY OF RICHMOND TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY re 22 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/9/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2015. Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/18/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 03-643 MEJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/23/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Gilmore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teralyn Renea Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savannah McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?