J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Castellon et al

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Jaime Robles Castellon, Casa Robles, Inc. and Ranferi Gomez
Case Number: 4:2015cv01941
Filed: April 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING 26 MOTION TO QUASH AND TO VACATE DEFAULT AND GRANTING 27 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT signed by Judge William H. Orrick 10/16/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Ex Parte Application to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Ex Parte Application to continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference continued to 9/8/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/22/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Castellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Robles Castellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa Robles, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranferi Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?