Boyce v. Independent Brewers United Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Victor Boyce
Defendant: Independent Brewers United Corporation, North American Breweries, Inc. and Pyramid Breweries, Inc
Case Number: 4:2015cv02263
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Court rules in favor of Defendants. No later than Monday, 6/12/2017, the parties shall submit a joint statement including language for a form of judgment, approved as to form. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/1/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/10/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ; granting 96 Plaintiff's Motion; denying 97 Defendant's Cross-Motion. Trial setting will be held 1/9/2017 at 2:00 PM. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/7/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/25/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING 63 Stipulation filed by Pyramid Breweries, Inc, North American Breweries, Inc., Independent Brewers United Corporation. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/4/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CERTAIN DISCOVERY DEADLINES re 54 Stipulation filed by Pyramid Breweries, Inc, North American Breweries, Inc., Independent Brewers United Corporation. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/10/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court sets a Case Management Conference to be held in this case on Monday, May 23, 2016 at 2:00pm. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER SETTING HEARING. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/10/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Court VACATES the hearing re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pyramid Breweries, Inc, North American Breweries, Inc., Independent Brewers United Corporation currently set for November 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/28/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/18/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS PYRAMID BREWERIES, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 18 Stipulation, filed by Victor Boyce, Pyramid Breweries, Inc, North American Breweries, Inc., Independent Brewers United Corporation, Pyramid Breweries, Inc terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/20/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyce v. Independent Brewers United Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Boyce
Represented By: Gregory Allen Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Brewers United Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Breweries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyramid Breweries, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?