Servpro Intellectual Property Inc. et al v. Proserve Building Service Maintenance Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Servpro Intellectual Property Inc. and Servpro Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Proserve Building Service Maintenance Inc., Hector Marquez and Does
Case Number: 4:2015cv02283
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 68 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/6/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
August 13, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING CASE SCHEDULE Mediation deadline/Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2015; Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2016 03:00 PM. Jury Selection /Jury Trial (5-day) set for 5/2/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/13/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 10, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 61 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 5, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 58 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
June 5, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Edward D. Lanquist, Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Servpro Intellectual Property Inc. et al v. Proserve Building Service Maintenance Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Servpro Intellectual Property Inc.
Represented By: Carey L Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Groendal
Represented By: Edward D Lanquist, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Servpro Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Carey L Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Groendal
Represented By: Edward D Lanquist, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proserve Building Service Maintenance Inc.
Represented By: Christopher McElwain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Marquez
Represented By: Christopher McElwain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?