United States Liability Insurance Company v. First Mercury Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: United States Liability Insurance Company
Defendant: First Mercury Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv02293
Filed: May 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL OF CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 29, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup denying 68 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
November 4, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEMotions terminated: 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Case Management Conference filed by First Mercury Insurance Company., ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/4/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
August 17, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO REMANDHolding in abeyance pending arbitration 9 12 Motions to dismiss; denying 28 motion to remand, granting in part and denying in part 43 44 Motions to strike or for Leave to File. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 13, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/13/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
July 7, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 36 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
July 2, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting 34 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Liability Insurance Company v. First Mercury Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Moris Davidovitz
Represented By: Robert Charles Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Corrine Kalvestran
Represented By: Sara M. Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter L. Isola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?