Smith et al v. Spark Energy, LLC

Plaintiff: Margaret Smith and Arturo Amaya
Defendant: Spark Energy, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv02326
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 83 Joint Motion to Vacate July 1, 2016 Status Conference. Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2016. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/27/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
May 31, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 81 Stipulated Request Regarding Case Schedule.Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/31/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 11, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS; AND GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/11/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
February 29, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/29/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
January 20, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/20/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 5, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/5/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
November 30, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 54 STIPULATION Permitting Plaintiffs to File a Sur-Reply and Defendant to File a Response; AND CONTINUING HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/30/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
August 27, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/27/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Spark Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spark Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Smith
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Sara Dawn Avila
Represented By: Theodore H. Chase
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Amaya
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Sara Dawn Avila
Represented By: Theodore H. Chase
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?