SunPower Corporation v. SunEdison, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: SunPower Corporation
Defendant: SunEdison, Inc., Shane Messer, Kendall Fong and Vikas Desai
Case Number: 4:2015cv02462
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/13/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
September 11, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 20 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. William H. Orrick. Any amended complaint shall be filed within 20 days of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
August 18, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 27 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ADJOURN THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - The Case Management Conference is continued to 9/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (to coincide with the hearing on motion to dismiss). Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/18/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
July 17, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SunPower Corporation v. SunEdison, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SunPower Corporation
Represented By: Amy Christensen Chun
Represented By: Michael K. Friedland
Represented By: Ali S Razai
Represented By: Boris Zelkind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunEdison, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vikas Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?