Hives vs. County of Alameda

Plaintiff: Patricia Hives
Defendant: County of Alameda, Derek Thoms and Walter Calhoun
Case Number: 4:2015cv02490
Filed: June 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/19/2016. (dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 4, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 63 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying without prejudice 59 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 79 Stipulation re Expert Discovery. Plaintiff M.C. is ordered to E-FILE the third amended complaint by 8/8/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
June 30, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying without prejudice 64 Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash. Joint letter due by 7/11/2016.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
April 22, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (As Modified) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 50 Stipulation modifying Case Management Deadlines. Motions terminated: 48 Stipulation with Proposed Order. Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2016 01:30 PM. Discovery due by 6/30/2016. Experts Discovery cut-off by 7/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/22/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
March 22, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 Proposed Protective Order filed by Derek Thoms, County of Alameda. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/22/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
December 1, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/01/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
August 25, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hives vs. County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hives
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Represented By: Timothy P. Murphy
Represented By: Owen Thomas Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Thoms
Represented By: Timothy P. Murphy
Represented By: Owen Thomas Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?