Nicole Zilveti v. Global Marketing Research Services, Inc

Plaintiff: Nicole Zilveti
Defendant: Global Marketing Research Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv02494
Filed: June 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ALL LITIGATION DEADLINES. All litigation deadlines are stayed until January 16, 2017. If a notice of dismissal has not been filed by January 16, 2017, the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 2, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ALL LITIGATION DEADLINES. All litigation deadlines are stayed until November 30, 2016. If a notice of dismissal has not been filed by November 30, 2016, the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 1, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
February 16, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, TRANSFER AND TO STRIKE; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 16, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
January 25, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 25, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
October 26, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS; DIRECTING INTERVENOR UNITED STATES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 26, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
July 24, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SERVE NOTICE ON UNITED STATES ATTORNEY; REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. No later than July 31, 2015, defendant is directed to ser ve on the United States Attorney (1) a Notice of Claim of Unconstitutionality with a copy of its Motion to Dismiss or Transfer attached thereto, and (2) a copy of this Order. Proof of such service shall be filed concurrently therewith. If the United States wishes to intervene for the purpose of opposing defendant's motion, it shall do so and file its opposition no later than August 28, 2015. Plaintiff shall file her opposition no later than August 28, 2015. Defendant shall file any reply n o later than September 4, 2015. The September 18, 2015, hearing on the motion will remain as scheduled. The Case Management Conference is continued from September 18, 2015, to October 23, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 24, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicole Zilveti v. Global Marketing Research Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Zilveti
Represented By: Matthew James O'Connor
Represented By: Patrick Harry Peluso
Represented By: Steven Lezell Woodrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Marketing Research Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Anthony Rambarran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?