Bodeker et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Doreen Bodeker and Robert Bodeker
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2015cv02507
Filed: June 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/26/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
August 20, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 26 Stipulation selecting Private ADR.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
August 13, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 6 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend within 14 Days. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodeker et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Bodeker
Represented By: Cary Scott Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bodeker
Represented By: Cary Scott Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Cara Lynne Finan
Represented By: Bernard Reynold Suter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?