Zou et al v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kai Zou and Brookelyn Thibodeaux
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv02587
Filed: June 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 27 Stipulation filed by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 4, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
September 29, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality filed by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 2, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. The case management conference currently scheduled for September 14, 2015 is vacated. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 9/9/2015. Mediation deadline 1/31/2016. Fact discovery due 4/21/2016. Expert disclosures du e 5/20/2016. Expert rebuttal due 6/17/2016. Dispositive motions due 7/15/2016. Expert discovery due 8/12/2016. Pretrial conference statement due 9/27/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 10/31/2016 - 11/17/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 2, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
August 19, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. filed by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 19, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
July 16, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Vacate Entry of Default filed by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zou et al v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kai Zou
Represented By: Angela Alioto
Represented By: Matthew Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brookelyn Thibodeaux
Represented By: Angela Alioto
Represented By: Matthew Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?