Lopez, et al v. Brown, et al

Plaintiff: Bobby Lopez, Marco Topete, John Myles, Ricardo Roldan, John Gonzales and Ronaldo Medrano Ayala
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jeffrey A. Beard and Ronald Davis
Case Number: 4:2015cv02725
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME re 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Ronald Davis, Marco Topete, Ricardo Roldan, John Myles, Ronaldo Medrano Ayala, Edmund G. Brown, Bobby Lopez, John Gonzales. Response due by 11/18/16. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/28/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
April 21, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE AND RE-SET STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Ronald Davis, Jeffrey A. Beard, Edmund G. Brown Status Conference set for 6/7/2016 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/21/2016. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
August 18, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/18/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
July 27, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/27/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez, et al v. Brown, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Lopez
Represented By: Emily Rose Naomi Johns
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Topete
Represented By: Emily Rose Naomi Johns
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Myles
Represented By: Emily Rose Naomi Johns
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Roldan
Represented By: Emily Rose Naomi Johns
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gonzales
Represented By: Emily Rose Naomi Johns
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronaldo Medrano Ayala
Represented By: Emily Rose Naomi Johns
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Represented By: Christine Marie Ciccotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard
Represented By: Christine Marie Ciccotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?