Shrestha v. Hertz Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Kewal Shrestha
Defendant: Hertz Corporation, American Traffic Solutions, Inc. and PlatePass, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv02998
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 42 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Kewal Shrestha. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/21/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 16, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF FEDERAL JURISDICTION AND MODIFYING SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING CAFA JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 16, 2015. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 9, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 Letter, filed by Hertz Corporation, for Adam Schloss, to appear by phone on 10/16/15 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/9/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shrestha v. Hertz Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kewal Shrestha
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Traffic Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Charles Duckers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PlatePass, LLC
Represented By: Edward Charles Duckers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?