Nokchan v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Michael Nokchan
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc., Raiser LLC and Hirease, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv03009
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Reference and Order re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/26/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 21, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint (Extension of time to Respond on behalf of Plaintiff, Rasier LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Hirease LLC) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Raiser LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/21/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 14, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 Stipulation filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Raiser LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
July 27, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 14-cv-5241. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/27/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nokchan v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Rod M. Fliegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser LLC
Represented By: Rod M. Fliegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hirease, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nokchan
Represented By: Tuvia Korobkin
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?