Ruga v. Voxer, Inc.

Plaintiff: Dylan Ruga
Defendant: Voxer, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv03059
Filed: July 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE filed by Dylan Ruga. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 6, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
October 21, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Early Neutral Evaluation filed by Voxer, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
September 14, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting ENE by Dylan Ruga filed by Dylan Ruga. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 14, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruga v. Voxer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Ruga
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Suren Naradha Weerasuriya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voxer, Inc.
Represented By: Brian David Buckley
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?