Moujaes v. San Francisco City and County et al

Plaintiff: Nyla Moujaes
Defendant: San Francisco City and County, San Francisco Police Department, Officer David B. Wasserman, Sergeant Buckner, Sergeant Flint T. Paul and Officer Barry
Case Number: 4:2015cv03129
Filed: July 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2017 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 124 Motion to Review Costs and granting 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
December 2, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on December 2, 2016. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
September 8, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Summary Judgment.(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
December 9, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 2/17/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moujaes v. San Francisco City and County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyla Moujaes
Represented By: Walter Phillip Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco City and County
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer David B. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Flint T. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?