Payne v. Office of the Commissioner of Baseball et al

Plaintiff: Gail Payne
Defendant: Office of the Commissioner of Baseball and Robert D. Manfred, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2015cv03229
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 52 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; granting 85 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 89 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 98 Stipulation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
June 29, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Hearing on Joint Discovery Brief 73 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/29/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
April 8, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 52 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Tampa Bay Rays Baseball Limited, Baltimore Orioles Limite d Partnership, The Chicago White Sox, The Tampa Bay Rays, Cleveland Indians Baseball Company Limited Partnership, The Baseball Club of Seattle LLP, The Chicago Cubs, San Francisco Giants Enterprises LLC, The New York Yankees, Washingt on Nationals Baseball Club, LLC, Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, L.P., St. Louis Cardinals LLC, The Washington Nationals, The Houston Astros, The St. Louis Cardinals, Miami Marlins, L.P., Chicago White Sox Ltd., Atlanta National Leag ue Baseball Club, Inc., The Boston Red Sox, New York Yankees Partnership, The Oakland Athletics, The Arizona Diamondbacks, The Atlantic Braves, The Seattle Mariners, Angels Baseball LP, Los Angeles Dodgers LLC, The Baltimore Orioles , The Philadelphia Phillies, The Kansas City Royals, The Pittsburg Pirates, Boston Red Sox Baseball Club Limited Partnership, The Los Angeles Dodgers, The Cincinnati Reds, Pittsburgh Associates, LP, Rangers Baseball Express LLC, The Cleveland Indians, Houston Astros, LLC, The San Francisco Giants, The Detroit Tigers, The San Diego Padres, Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, The Cincinnati Reds LLC, Chicago National League Ball Club, LLC, The Los Angeles Ange ls of Anaheim, The Milwaukee Brewers, Detroit Tigers, Inc., Robert D. Manfred, Jr., San Diego Padres Baseball Club, L.P., Minnesota Twins Baseball Club, The Miami Marlins, The Minnesota Twins, The Texas Rangers, Sterling Mets, L.P., Arizona Professional Baseball LP, The New York Mets, Kansas City Royals, The Colorado Rockies, Colorado Rockies Baseball Club, Ltd., Oakland Athletics Limited Partnership. The Court defers ruling on the remainder of the motion pending the contemplated jurisdictional discovery on standing and briefing thereon. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/8/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
March 25, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re 52 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/22/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
October 27, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule. Motions terminated: 37 MOTION to Dismiss CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/27/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 16, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Deadline to File Response In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/23/2015. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/16/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
September 24, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER For Administrative Relief From Initial Case Management Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/24/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Office of the Commissioner of Baseball et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Commissioner of Baseball
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Represented By: John Watkins Keker
Represented By: Robert Adam Lauridsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Manfred, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Represented By: John Watkins Keker
Represented By: Robert Adam Lauridsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Payne
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Anthea Grivas
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Marion Magdalene Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?