Californians For Renewable Energy et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al

Plaintiff: Californians For Renewable Energy, Ashurst Bar/Smith Community Organization, Citizens for Alternatives to Radioactive Dumping, Maurice and Jane Sugar Law Center for Economic and Social Justice, Sierra Club and Michael Boyd
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency and Gina McCarthy
Case Number: 4:2015cv03292
Filed: July 15, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER OF REFERENCE FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/7/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
June 8, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2016 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/8/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
February 19, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/19/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
November 9, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Stipulated Request to Extend Stay Pending Settlement Negotiations. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/09/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Californians For Renewable Energy et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Californians For Renewable Energy
Represented By: Marianne Leslie Engelman Lado
Represented By: Irene V. Gutierrez
Represented By: Jonathan James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashurst Bar/Smith Community Organization
Represented By: Marianne Leslie Engelman Lado
Represented By: Irene V. Gutierrez
Represented By: Jonathan James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens for Alternatives to Radioactive Dumping
Represented By: Marianne Leslie Engelman Lado
Represented By: Irene V. Gutierrez
Represented By: Jonathan James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice and Jane Sugar Law Center for Economic and Social Justice
Represented By: Marianne Leslie Engelman Lado
Represented By: Irene V. Gutierrez
Represented By: Jonathan James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Marianne Leslie Engelman Lado
Represented By: Irene V. Gutierrez
Represented By: Jonathan James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Boyd
Represented By: Marianne Leslie Engelman Lado
Represented By: Irene V. Gutierrez
Represented By: Jonathan James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?