McNeal v. AccentCare, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sharina McNeal
Defendant: AccentCare, Inc. and AccentCare of California, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv03304
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING; DENYING AS MOOT 32 MOTION to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/8/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 4, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/4/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015) Modified on 9/4/2015 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/24/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 3, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/3/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. AccentCare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AccentCare, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Cooper
Represented By: Max Fischer
Represented By: Robert Joseph Kane
Represented By: Tiffanie Nicole Limbrick
Represented By: Angela C. Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AccentCare of California, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Cooper
Represented By: Max Fischer
Represented By: Robert Joseph Kane
Represented By: Tiffanie Nicole Limbrick
Represented By: Angela C. Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharina McNeal
Represented By: Louis Max Benowitz
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Robert Walter Ottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?