Greenfield v. Criterion Capital Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: STACEY GREENFIELD
Defendant: Criterion Capital Management, LLC, Criterion Capital Partners Master Fund, L.P., Criterion Capital Partners Master Fund GP, Ltd., Criterion Horizons Master Fund, L.P., Criterion Horizons Master Fund GP, Ltd., Criterion Vista Master Fund, L.P., Criterion Vista Master Fund GP, L.P., Christopher H. Lord, David Riley, Tomoko Fortune and Veeva Systems Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv03583
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 73 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 82 Motion for Leave to File. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
July 5, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Dismiss; granting 60 Motion to Stay Discovery. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
April 25, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 50 Declaration in Opposition, filed by Stacey Greenfield. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/25/2016. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
November 20, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 32 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/20/2015. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
October 1, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9879170.) filed by Criterion Capital Partners Master Fund, L.P., David Riley, Criterion Horizons Master Fund, L.P., Christopher H. Lord, Criterion Vista Master Fund, L.P., Criterion Capital Partners Master Fund GP, Ltd., Criterion Capital Management, LLC, Tomoko Fortune, Criterion Horizons Master Fund GP, Ltd., Criterion Vista Master Fund GP, L.P.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/1/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenfield v. Criterion Capital Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criterion Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Michael Everett Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criterion Capital Partners Master Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Everett Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criterion Capital Partners Master Fund GP, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Everett Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criterion Horizons Master Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Everett Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criterion Horizons Master Fund GP, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Everett Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criterion Vista Master Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Everett Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criterion Vista Master Fund GP, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Everett Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher H. Lord
Represented By: Michael Everett Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Riley
Represented By: Michael Everett Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomoko Fortune
Represented By: Michael Everett Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veeva Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY GREENFIELD
Represented By: Paul D. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?