Horowitz v. Merz North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sanae Horowitz
Defendant: Merz North America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv03602
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/06/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
May 3, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 37 Joint Discovery Letter filed by Merz North America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/03/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 6, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation filed by Sanae Horowitz, Merz North America, Inc. As Modified. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/06/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
October 19, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Merz North America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/19/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horowitz v. Merz North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanae Horowitz
Represented By: Jeremy David Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merz North America, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell F. Boomer
Represented By: Scott Philip Jang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?