Alem v. Arnold

Petitioner: Daniel Alem
Respondent: Eric Arnold
Case Number: 4:2015cv03649
Filed: August 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. A certification of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/6/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
August 24, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 10/23/2015.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/24/2015. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order and the petition and all attachments thereto upon respondent and respondent's counsel, the Attorney General of the State of California. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 19, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/19/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alem v. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Alem
Represented By: Robert Joseph Beles
Represented By: Paul Gilruth McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?