Chenault v. City of San Ramon, et al

Plaintiff: Odis William Chenault, Jr.
Defendant: San Ramon Police Department and City of San Ramon
Case Number: 4:2015cv03662
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
March 4, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Granting 29 .(sklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016) Modified on 3/4/2016 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER (JURY). Discovery due by 7/20/2016. Motions to be heard by 9/7/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 12/5/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 1/13/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chenault v. City of San Ramon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odis William Chenault, Jr.
Represented By: Mark William Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Ramon Police Department
Represented By: Noah G. Blechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Ramon
Represented By: Noah G. Blechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?