Karasek et al v. Regents of the University of California, The
Plaintiff: Sofie Karasek, Nicoletta Commins and Aryle Butler
Defendant: Regents of the University of California, The
Case Number: 4:2015cv03717
Filed: August 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 158 STIPULATION re 156 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/8/2021. Replies due by 2/24/2021. Motion Hearing reset for 3/10/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/21/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion to Dismiss0. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2020. Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2020 02:00 PM via Videoconference. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING 114 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/12/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER TO EXTEND 116 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OPPOSITION AND REPLY DATE - Response due by 2/28/2018. Reply due by 3/21/2018. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/23/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER TO STAY DISCOVERY AND CONTINUE THE PRETRIAL SCHEDULE granting, as modified, 108 STIPULATION. Close of Fact Discovery: 1/8/2018. Dispositive Motion to be heard by 7/13/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2018 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 11/13/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/30/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 STIPULATION to Continue the Pretrial Schedule. Close of Fact Discovery: 9/8/2017. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 3/7/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2018 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 6/4/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/23/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 87 Motion to Dismiss. Karasek and Commins's Title IX claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. The University shall file its answer in response to Butlers allegations within twenty days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William H. Orrick granting 57 Motion to Dismiss. Karasek and Commins's Title IX claims are DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiffs shall file their fourth amended complaint, if a ny, within 20 days of the date of this Order. The parties' sealing motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If either side wants any materials filed in connection with the University's motion to dismiss to remain under seal, it shall file an administrative motion within seven days of the date of this Order narrowing its sealing requests and articulating compelling reasons in support of sealing. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AMENDED ORDER extending deadlines as to 57 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 5/31/2016. Reply due by 6/10/2016. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/25/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 59 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's 57 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. Response due by 5/31/2016. Reply due by 6/7/2016. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/24/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Interim Protective Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 46 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick. The University's 18 motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs shall file their third amended complaint within 60 days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Orrick on 24 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 STIPULATION Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference continued to 12/15/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/23/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karasek et al v. Regents of the University of California, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of the University of California, The
Represented By: Hailyn Jennifer Chen
Represented By: Jeslyn A Miller
Represented By: Karen Jensen Petrulakis
Represented By: Bradley S. Phillips
Represented By: Thane Rehn
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson
Represented By: Margaret Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofie Karasek
Represented By: Ryan Marc Cohen
Represented By: Devin Miles Storey
Represented By: Alexander Solomon Zalkin
Represented By: Irwin Myron Zalkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicoletta Commins
Represented By: Ryan Marc Cohen
Represented By: Devin Miles Storey
Represented By: Alexander Solomon Zalkin
Represented By: Irwin Myron Zalkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aryle Butler
Represented By: Ryan Marc Cohen
Represented By: Devin Miles Storey
Represented By: Alexander Solomon Zalkin
Represented By: Irwin Myron Zalkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?