IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. et al v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. and IXI IP,LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 4:2015cv03755
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 212 Stipulation of Dismissal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 210 Administrative Motion TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 5:19-cv-06769 NC and 4:15-cv-03755 HSG. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/23/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING (Docket Nos. 157 in 4:15-cv-03755-HSG and 166 in 4:15-cv-03752-HSG) Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave To Amend Infringement Contentions and Asserted Claims. The Court SETS a further Case Management Conference for October 22, 2019 at 2:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by October 15, 2019.(hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 178 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Joze Welsh. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 145 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert S. Reich. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 107 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Gregory T. Chuebon (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 91 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John J. Higson (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 95 Motion to Expedite Hearing Date of Case Management Conference (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/3/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. et al v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas Steven Biemer
Represented By: Gary David Colby
Represented By: Jennifer S. Coleman
Represented By: Marie-Theres DiFillippo
Represented By: Mark William Halderman
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Aleksandr Korzh
Represented By: John V. Picone, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Represented By: Joshua David Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IXI IP,LLC
Represented By: Thomas Steven Biemer
Represented By: Gary David Colby
Represented By: Jennifer S. Coleman
Represented By: Marie-Theres DiFillippo
Represented By: Mark William Halderman
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Aleksandr Korzh
Represented By: John V. Picone, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Represented By: Joshua David Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Gregory Todd Chuebon
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Represented By: Patrick E. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?