Howe v. PNC Mortgage

Appellant: Karina Lee Howe
Appellee: PNC Mortgage
Trustee: Office of the Trustee / SF
Case Number: 4:2015cv03876
Filed: August 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLARIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/24/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 18, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation to Extend All Deadlines in Appeal.Appellee's Brief due by 1/19/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 18, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
October 26, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL TO BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR CONSIDERATION re 7 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Karina Lee Howe. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/26/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howe v. PNC Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Karina Lee Howe
Represented By: Judson Hamor Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PNC Mortgage
Represented By: Matthew Richard Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the Trustee / SF
Represented By: Julie Marie Glosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?