Evanston Insurance Company v. Uber Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv03988
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 76 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 14, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 74 STIPULATION OF PARTIAL VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 16, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT IN PRINCIPLE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
May 11, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 58 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 5, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 54 55 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS OF ATTORNEYS SARAH BALTZELL AND STAN SEXTON. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
February 17, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS 52 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
December 14, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 26 MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
November 30, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/30/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 23, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 28 REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ADR CERTIFICATION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 17, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 31 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/26/15. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Irene K. Yesowitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: David Evan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?