Hamid Amiri v. Glenn W Groff et al

Plaintiff: Hamid Amiri
Defendant: Glenn W Groff and Bay Harbour Care Home
Case Number: 4:2015cv03994
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 68 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 88 Motion to Strike. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
August 21, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/21/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
June 2, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2. Pretrial Conference reset for 3/22/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection reset for 4/9/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San F rancisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial reset for 4/9/2018 to 4/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/1/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
October 14, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2.Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 6/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Fra ncisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 6/19/2017 to 6/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/14/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
December 11, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 11/7/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 11/7/2016 to 11/17/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamid Amiri v. Glenn W Groff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn W Groff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Harbour Care Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamid Amiri
Represented By: Benjamin J. Holl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?