Nasseri v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Fariba Nasseri
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2015cv04001
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 56 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 1, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 54 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
March 22, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 51 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 21, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 49 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
December 23, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 34 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
November 23, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Judge William Alsup [denying 9 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 18, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/18/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 4, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/4/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
September 9, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Plaintiff and Defendant's counsel shall participate in a telephone conference, to be scheduled by the ADR Unit as soon as possible but no later than September 25, 2015. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/9/2015. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasseri v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fariba Nasseri
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas Nathaniel Abbott
Represented By: Jason M. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?