Patten v. Hancock

Plaintiff: Leon Patten
Defendant: Leland W. Hancock, Beverly J. Hancock and Christopher Allen Frazier
Case Number: 4:2015cv04022
Filed: September 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/22/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
January 14, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING TRANSFER OF VENUE. Show Cause Response due by 1/29/2016. Responses due by 2/12/2016. Replies due by 2/19/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/14/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 5, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 31 Objections to Tardy Opposition Brief and Permitting Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 5, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 7, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR REPLY AND HEARING ON 23 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Replies due by 12/18/2015. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 7, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 24, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PARTIES TO SHOW CAUSE and Order VACATING Hearing on 14 , 16 and 23 Motion and Corrected Motions to Dismiss. Parties' Responses to Order to Show Cause due by 12/7/2015. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 24, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patten v. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Patten
Represented By: Lars T. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland W. Hancock
Represented By: Cris Campbell Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly J. Hancock
Represented By: Cris Campbell Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Allen Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?