Johnson v. Sears Hometown and Outlet Stores, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Breana Johnson
Defendant: Sears Hometown and Outlet Stores, Inc., Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC and Sears Outlet Stores, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv04026
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS LAWSUIT WITH PREJUDICE filed by Breana Johnson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 4, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
May 13, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 27 Joint Case Management Statement filed by SEARS HOMETOWN AND OUTLET STORES, INC., Sears Hometown and Outlet Stores, Inc., Sears Outlet Stores, LLC, Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
November 5, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ARBITRATE CLAIM AND STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by Breana Johnson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 5, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Sears Hometown and Outlet Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breana Johnson
Represented By: Arthur William Lazear
Represented By: Morgan Matthew Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Hometown and Outlet Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Rick Richmond
Represented By: Lewis David Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC
Represented By: Rick Richmond
Represented By: Lewis David Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Outlet Stores, LLC
Represented By: Rick Richmond
Represented By: Lewis David Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?