Balance Studio, Inc. v. Cybernet Entertainment, LLC
Plaintiff: Balance Studio, Inc.
Defendant: Cybernet Entertainment, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv04038
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/1/2017. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 39 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 32 Motion to Proceed under a Pseudonym; striking entries 17 , 20 , 23 from the docket. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER to File Supplemental Information re 32 MOTION to proceed under a pseudonym filed by Balance Studio, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/22/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part 25 Motion for Temporary Order Allowing Counter Defendant to Proceed Under a Pseudonym. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 9 Motion to Dismiss and Setting Initial Case Management Conference for 06/01/2016 at 1:30 p.m. Joint Case Management Statement due by 05/25/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balance Studio, Inc. v. Cybernet Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cybernet Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balance Studio, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Rachel Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?