Conde et al v. 2020 Companies LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Conde, Shikwana Jennings and Lisa Drake
Defendant: 2020 Companies LLC, Open Door Marketing, LLC, Barry Millay, Larry Dale Clark, 20/20 Communications, Inc. and Jerrimy Farris
Case Number: 4:2015cv04080
Filed: September 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #312 Stipulation of Entry of Judgment. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 312 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings and 20/20 Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/27/2018) Modified on 11/27/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #297 Motion for Settlement. Stipulation of dismissal or status report due within 60 days. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 310 Joint STATUS REPORT re Second Amendment to Settlement Agreement by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Shikwana Jennings and Lisa Drake. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 9/12/2018) Modified on 9/12/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER Regarding #297 MOTION for Settlement Approval. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/28/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 307 NOTICE to Court Re Amendment to Settlement Agreement, re Exhibit A Settlement Agreement (297-1) - by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Shikwana Jennings and Lisa Drake. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 8/17/2018) Modified on 8/20/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2018 Filing 308 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Matter submitted. Court to issue order. Motion Hearing held on 8/16/2018 re #297 . MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by Shikwana Jennings, Lisa Drake. FTR Time: 1:34-2:03. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 306 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/16/2018 1:34:53 PM ]. File Size [ 13712 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:28:34 ]. (courtspeak).
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #304 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 304 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 303 Supplemental Brief re #297 MOTION for Settlement Approval filed byLisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #297 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Amended ORDER Requiring Supplemental Briefing re #297 MOTION for Settlement Approval. Supplemental brief due by August 8, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. PST. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/31/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER Requiring Supplemental Briefing re #297 MOTION for Settlement Approval. Supplemental brief due by August 6, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. PST. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/27/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER requiring Chambers Copy re: #297 . The Court did not receive a chambers copy of this document. The party shall lodge a copy of all documents and tabbed exhibits, if applicable, within three days of this order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/20/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018) Modified on 7/20/2018 (kawlc2, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #298 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 298 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Michael) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 297 MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 7/26/2018. Replies due by 8/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER Regarding Notice of Settlement to Opt-In Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/2/2018. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding Notice of Settlement. Joint motion for settlement approval due by 7/12/2018. Motion Hearing on joint motion for settlement approval set for 8/16/2018 at 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 294 REVISED Joint Request for Telephonic Status Conference by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings, 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/28/2018) Modified on 6/29/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER re #292 Joint Request for Telephonic Status Conference. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/28/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 292 Joint Request for Telephonic Status Conference by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings, 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/28/2018) Modified on 6/28/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2018 Filing 291 STATUS REPORT (Joint) regarding Status of Open Door Defendants by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/22/2018) Modified on 6/22/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER re #289 Notice of Settlement and Status of Open Door Defendants. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/20/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 289 MOTION for Settlement - filed as Notice of Settlement filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Chambers before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 6/27/2018. Replies due by 7/5/2018. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #275 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 7, 2018 Filing 287 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Shannon Liss-Riordan (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER re #275 Matthew Carlson's MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/5/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER. Per the #235 Court's order staying Defendants' motion to compel, the parties were to file a joint status update once the Supreme Court issued a ruling on the Morris v. Ernst & Young appeal. On May 21, 2018, the Supreme Court issued its decision therein. Accordingly, the parties are ordered to file their joint status report within two weeks of this order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/4/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
June 1, 2018 Filing 283 RESPONSE to re #280 Order Regarding Matthew Carlson's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
June 1, 2018 Filing 282 NOTICE by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings of Withdrawal of Michael Freedman (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
June 1, 2018 Filing 281 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Liss-Riordan (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #277 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Jill Kahn. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER re #275 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Matthew D. Carlson. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/31/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 279 MANDATE of USCA as to #250 Notice of Appeal, filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 14, 2018 Filing 278 NOTICE by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings of Withdrawal of Opt-in Forms (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 277 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Jill Kahn filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. Responses due by 5/25/2018. Replies due by 6/1/2018. (Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER of USCA Dismissing Appeal as to #250 Notice of Appeal, filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., #253 USCA Case Number (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 275 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Matthew D. Carlson filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. Responses due by 5/4/2018. Replies due by 5/11/2018. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding #256 #257 #264 Joint Discovery Letters. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE re #271 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Dale Clark, Shikwana Jennings, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC, Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake. Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/19/2018. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/19/2018. Motions due by 7/10/2018. Rebuttal Expert Discovery due by 6/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/6/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 272 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 2, 2017, before Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #259 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2018. (Related documents(s) #259 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 271 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Open Door Marketing LLC, Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Shikwana Jennings, Carlos Conde and Lisa Drake. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/2/2018) Modified on 3/5/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2018 Filing 270 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Arguments heard, matter submitted. Court to issue order. Discovery Hearing held on 2/15/2018.FTR Time: 1:11-1:37. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/15/2018)
February 15, 2018 Filing 269 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF HEARING - Notice is hereby given that the Discovery Hearing, previously set for February 15, 2018, at 11:00 am, is continued to February 15, 2018, at 1:00 p.m.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #265 Defendant 20/20 Communication, Inc.'s Motion to Appear by Telephone. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #263 Defendants Open Door Marketing, LLC's, Jerrimy Farris's, and Larry Clark's Motion to Appear by Telephone. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #262 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear by Telephone. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 265 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Attorney Wendy V. Miller, filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting W. Miller's Telephonic Appearance)(Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 264 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief- Joint - filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 2/5/2018) Modified on 2/6/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2018 Filing 263 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 262 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER re #256 #257 Discovery Letter Briefs. Parties' supplemental joint discovery letter due by February 5, 2018. Discovery Hearing set for 2/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/24/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding #247 #248 Discovery Letters. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 4, 2018 Filing 259 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 2, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore by 20/20 Communications, Inc., for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 Filing 258 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on November 2, 2017 before Judge Kandis A. Westmore, re #250 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 2/14/2018. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
December 21, 2017 Filing 257 Discovery Letter Brief- Regarding Plaintiff Jennings' Response to Interrogatory No. 20 and Plaintiff Drake's Response to Interrogatory No. 16 - filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 256 Discovery Letter Brief- Regarding Plaintiff Jennings' and Drake's Responses to Request for Production No. 1 - filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 255 - Joint - STATUS REPORT by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Open Door Marketing, LLC, Shikwana Jennings, Jerrimy Farris, Lisa Drake and Larry Dale Clark. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 12/19/2017) Modified on 12/20/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2017 Filing 254 USCA Case Number 17-17482 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #251 Notice of Appeal, filed by Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 253 USCA Case Number 17-17481 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #250 Notice of Appeal, filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 252 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/12/2017. Parties to meet and confer on the scope and substance of written discovery and depositions re: the opt-in Plaintiffs. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/5/2018. Close of Fact Discovery due by 4/2/2018. Motions due by 4/26/2018.FTR Time: 2:12-2:55. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/12/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 251 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11937950 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Representation Statement)(Thompson, Michael) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 250 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11937755 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Staying Motion to Compel; Granting Motion to Join, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant Appellant's Representation Statement)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 249 CLERK'S NOTICE- Case Management Conference will be held in Courtroom 5 on the 2nd floor.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 5, 2017 Filing 248 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Written Discovery Requests Propounded to Certain Opt-in Plaintiffs filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings and 20/20 Communications Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 12/5/2017) Modified on 12/6/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2017 Filing 247 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Proposed Opt-in Discovery Plan filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings, Open Door Marketing LLC, Jerrimy Farris and Larry Dale Clark. (Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 12/5/2017) Modified on 12/6/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2017 Filing 246 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for December 7, 2017, is continued to December 12, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. All orders granting Motions to Appear by Telephone are carried over to the new date. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 245 Updated JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Open Door Marketing LLC, Jerrimy Farris, Larry Dale Clark, Shikwana Jennings and Lisa Drake. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/28/2017) Modified on 11/29/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #243 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 243 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Attorney Jill Kahn filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #240 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #239 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 240 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed as Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Request for Attorney Christopher W. Decker to Appear by Telephone filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Request for Attorney Christopher W. Decker to Appear by Telephone)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 21, 2017 Filing 239 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING DATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/15/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 237 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #233 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Equitable Tolling of the Statue of Limitations for FLSA Claims of Expanded Collective Opt-in Plaintiff's filed as Joint Stipulation of Parties and Proposed Order Regarding Stay of Plaintiffs' Motion for Equitable Tolling of Statute of Limitations for FLSA Claims of Expanded Collective Opt In Plaintiffs filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Open Door Marketing, LLC, Jerrimy Farris and Larry Dale Clark. (Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 11/14/2017) Modified on 11/15/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2017 Filing 236 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for December 5, 2017, is continued to December 7, 2017, at 11:00 a.m., to be heard along with the motion, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Staying #216 Motion to Compel Arbitration; Granting #227 Motion for Joinder. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2017 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/8/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #233 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Equitable Tolling of the Statue of Limitations for FLSA Claims of Expanded Collective Opt-in Plaintiff's . Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2017 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 234 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Arguments heard, matter submitted. Court to issue order. Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2017, re #216 MOTION to Compel (1) Arbitration of Claims by Opt-In Plaintiffs N. Huntley, K. Moody, I. Sims, M. Sweeney and A. Trujillo and (2) Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay Arbitrable Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support There filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc. Total Time in Court: 27 minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/2/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 233 Plaintiff's MOTION for Equitable Tolling of the Statue of Limitations for FLSA Claims of Expanded Collective Opt-in Plaintiffs filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. Responses due by 11/15/2017. Replies due by 11/22/2017. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 11/1/2017) Modified on 11/1/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #231 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 231 MOTION to Appear by Telephone of Michael L. Thompson filed by Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Michael) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 230 NOTICE of Filing of Opt In Consent Forms by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opt In Forms)(Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 10/4/2017) Modified on 10/4/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2017 Filing 229 NOTICE Filing of Opt In Consent Forms by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings Filing of Opt In Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Opt In Forms)(Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 9/29/2017) Modified on 9/29/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #225 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael Thompson. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 227 MOTION for Joinder to 20/20 Communication's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Smith, Kristin) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 226 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY. SEE DOCKET #225 FOR CORRECT FILING.*** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission; Proposed Order ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 2654RTFK.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/28/2017 filed by Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Smith, Kristin) (Filed on 9/28/2017) Modified on 9/29/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2017 Filing 225 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11758315.) filed by Larry Dale Clark, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Smith, Kristin) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 224 NOTICE of Filing of Opt In Consent Forms by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Opt In Forms)(Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 9/22/2017) Modified on 9/22/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing re #216 MOTION to Compel Arbitration from October 5, 2017 to November 2, 2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/19/2017. (This is a text only entry; there is no document associated with this notice.) (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 222 NOTICE OF filing of Opt In Consent Forms by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings (Attachments: #1 Appendix D - Opt In Forms)(Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 9/15/2017) Modified on 9/18/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2017 Filing 221 REPLY (re #216 MOTION to Compel (1) Arbitration of Claims by Opt-In Plaintiffs N. Huntley, K. Moody, I. Sims, M. Sweeney and A. Trujillo and (2) Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay Arbitrable Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support There ) in Support of Defendant's (1) Motion to Compel Arbitration and (2) Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, Stay Arbitrable Claims filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wendy Miller in Further Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit A to W. Miller Declaration, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service to Reply, Declaration of W. Miller)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 220 NOTICE Filing of Opt In Consent Forms by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-Notice of Opt-Ins)(Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 9/8/2017) Modified on 9/8/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2017 Filing 219 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #216 MOTION to Compel (1) Arbitration of Claims by Opt-In Plaintiffs N. Huntley, K. Moody, I. Sims, M. Sweeney and A. Trujillo and (2) Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay Arbitrable Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support There ) filed byLisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 218 NOTICE of Opt In Consent Forms by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opt In Forms)(Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2017 Filing 217 NOTICE by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings Filing of Opt In Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Notice of Opt-Ins)(Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 216 MOTION to Compel (1) Arbitration of Claims by Opt-In Plaintiffs N. Huntley, K. Moody, I. Sims, M. Sweeney and A. Trujillo and (2) Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay Arbitrable Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 9/7/2017. Replies due by 9/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christopher W. Decker In Support of Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit A - B to Decker Declaration, #3 Declaration Kimberly Warren In Support Of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #4 Exhibit A - G to Warren Declaration, #5 Declaration Chian Burks In Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #6 Declaration Wendy V. Miller In Support of Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 215 NOTICE by Shikwana Jennings Filing of Opt In Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt-In Forms)(Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
July 25, 2017 Filing 214 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/25/2017. Expert disclosures due by 2/2/2018. Motions to be filed by 3/29/2018. Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 3/1/2018.FTR Time 1:40-2:35. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/25/2017)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #200 Stipulated Protective Order. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE: PLAN FOR NOTICE TO EXPANDED COLLECTIVE re #209 Proposed Order filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/21/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #210 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2017 Filing 210 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Case Management Conference on Tuesday, July 25th at 1:30pm filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 209 Proposed Order re #202 Stipulation, Plan for Notice to Expanded Collective by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER requiring Chambers Copy re: #200 #201 . The Court did not receive a chambers copy of these documents. The party shall lodge a copy of all documents and tabbed exhibits, if applicable, within three days of this order. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/20/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #205 Motion to Appear by Telephone re Larry Clark. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #204 Motion to Appear by Telephone re Jerrimy Farris. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2017 Filing 205 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Larry Dale Clark. (Clark, Larry) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 204 First MOTION to Appear by Telephone 8176831429 filed by Jerrimy Farris. (Farris, Jerrimy) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 18, 2017 Filing 203 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - Updated - filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Dale Clark, Lisa Drake, Jerrimy Farris and Shikwana Jennings. (Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 7/18/2017) Modified on 7/19/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2017 Filing 202 STIPULATION re #184 Stipulation, regarding Plan for Notice to Expanded Collective filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Dale Clark, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings and Jerrimy Farris. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 7/18/2017) Modified on 7/18/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2017 Filing 201 Declaration of Wendy V. Miller in Support of #200 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order - tracked, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #200 ) (Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
July 17, 2017 Filing 200 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Dale Clark, Lisa Drake, Jerrimy Farris and Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 7/17/2017) Modified on 7/18/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #196 Administrative Motion to Include Link to DocuSign. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2017 Filing 198 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #196 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Include Link to DocuSign in Notice to Expanded Collective ) filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wendy V. Miller ISO Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief to Include Link to Docusign in Notice to Expanded Collective)(Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
July 10, 2017 Filing 197 Answer to Amended Complaint - Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
July 5, 2017 Filing 196 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Include Link to DocuSign in Notice to Expanded Collective filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. Responses due by 7/10/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration Jill Kahn, #3 Proposed Order)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 195 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 20/20 Communications, Inc., Jerrimy Farris, Barry Millay, Open Door Marketing, LLC. Filed byShikwana Jennings, Lisa Drake, Carlos Conde. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 194 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER re #189 Joint Letter on Proposed Notice to Expanded Certified Collective. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/22/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #171 #173 Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2017 Filing 191 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. CMC set for 7/18/17 at 1:30 pm. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 15, 2017 Filing 190 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for June 27, 2017, is continued to July 18, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 189 Letter from Joint regarding Order on Joint Stipulation Regarding Form of Notice for Expanded FLSA Collective and 20/20 Communications, Inc. (Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 6/2/2017) Modified on 6/5/2017 (jmlS, RT STAFF).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Discharging #168 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/31/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Vacating June 1, 2017 Hearing; Denying as Moot #182 #186 Motions to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/30/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2017 Filing 186 First MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Larry Dale Clark. (Clark, Larry) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER re #184 Stipulation Regarding Form of Notice for Expanded FLSA Collective. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/25/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 184 STIPULATION re #178 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed as Joint Stipulation of Plaintiffs and Defendant 20.20 Communications, Inc. Regarding Form of Notice for Expanded FLSA Collective filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 15, 2017 Filing 183 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings and 2020 Communications, Inc. (Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 5/15/2017) Modified on 5/16/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2017 Filing 182 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed as Request for Telephonic Appearance at Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 9, 2017 Filing 181 Plaintiff's Response to Court's Order Regarding Supplemental Briefing In Support of Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #173 ) (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 5/9/2017) Modified on 5/10/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Regarding Supplemental Briefing on #171 Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' supplemental briefing is due by May 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/5/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017) Modified on 5/8/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2017 Filing 179 REPLY (re #173 Notice of Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint) filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 5/4/2017) Modified on 5/5/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part #139 Motion to Expand the Collective Action; granting in part and denying in part #143 Motion to Deny Class Certification; denying #144 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 27, 2017 Filing 177 Response to Order to Show Cause byJerrimy Farris. (Farris, Jerrimy) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 27, 2017 Filing 176 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Opposition to #173 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 4/27/2017) Modified on 4/28/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2017 Filing 175 Response to Order to Show Cause byLarry Dale Clark. (Clark, Larry) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 27, 2017 Filing 174 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings . (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 14, 2017 Filing 173 MOTION and Notice of Motion, [Proposed] Order for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Fourth Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 4/14/2017) Modified on 4/17/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2017 Filing 172 CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY Re: Dkt. No. 171. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 14, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #173 MOTION for Leave to File and Notice of Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Responses due by 4/27/2017. Replies due by 5/4/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2017 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 13, 2017 Filing 171 NOTICE of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to the Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Proposed Order)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 4/13/2017) Modified on 4/14/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2017 Filing 170 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 20/20 Communications, Inc. re #167 Letter Brief, to Co-Defendants Clarke, Farris and Open Door Marketing, LLC (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 169 Supplemental Brief re #139 MOTION Expand Scope of Certified Collective Action and Issue Additional Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216(B) filed byLisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Related document(s) #139 ) (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/27/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/6/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2017 Filing 167 Letter Brief re #143 MOTION Deny Class Certification re #139 MOTION Expand Scope of Certified Collective Action and Issue Additional Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216(B) filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Related document(s) #143 ) (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 4, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing re #164 Case Management Conference - Further,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Further Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2017 01:30 PM. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Regarding Discovery. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/3/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore. The Court TERMINATES as moot #21 Motion to Certify Collective Action, as the Court's order on Plaintiffs' pending #139 Motion to Expand the Scope of the Certified Collective Action will resolve any outstanding issues raised by that motion. (This is a text-only entry; there is no document associated with this notice.) (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
March 30, 2017 Filing 164 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Court to issur order re: meet & confer.Further Case Management Conference held on 3/30/2017. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2017. Motions due by 4/13/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2017 01:30 PM.FTR Time 12:09-12:33. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/30/2017) Modified on 4/4/2017 (sisS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2017 Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Parties to file supplemental briefing re: Motion to Expand Scope by 4/6/17.Motion Hearing held on 3/30/2017. re #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., #143 MOTION Deny Class Certification re #139 MOTION Expand Scope of Certified Collective Action and Issue Additional Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216(B) filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., #139 MOTION Expand Scope of Certified Collective Action and Issue Additional Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216(B) filed by Shikwana Jennings, Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake FTR Time 11:25-12:09. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/30/2017)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #161 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2017 Filing 161 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Jerrimy Farris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 Filing 160 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 20/20 Communications, Inc. re #159 Joint Case Management Statement (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 159 UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/23/2017) Modified on 3/24/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #157 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2017 Filing 157 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Larry Clarke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 17, 2017 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 20/20 Communications, Inc. re #154 Reply to Opposition/Response, #155 Reply to Opposition/Response,, (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 16, 2017 Filing 155 REPLY (re #143 MOTION Deny Class Certification re #139 MOTION Expand Scope of Certified Collective Action and Issue Additional Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216(B) ) filed as 20/20 Communication, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Deny Class Certification filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Decker In Support of Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Deny Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of C. Decker ISO Defendant's Reply Memorandum ISO Motion to Deny Class Certification)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 16, 2017 Filing 154 REPLY (re #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed as Reply in Further Support of Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 13, 2017 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 20/20 Communications, Inc. re #152 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 152 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #139 MOTION Expand Scope of Certified Collective Action and Issue Additional Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216(B) ) filed as 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Expand Scope of Certified Collective Action and Issue Additional Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(B) filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 151 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #143 MOTION Deny Class Certification re #139 MOTION Expand Scope of Certified Collective Action and Issue Additional Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216(B) ) filed byLisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 150 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byCarlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 2, 2017 Filing 149 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 20/20 Communications, Inc. re #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A pt. 1, #2 Exhibit A pt. 2)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 148 Proposed Order re #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 147 Joint Stipulation of Plaintiff Shikwana Jennings and Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc. re Authenticity of Letter to Labor Workforce Development Agency filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/1/2017) Modified on 3/2/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2017 Filing 146 Declaration of Christopher W. Decker in Support of #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #144 ) (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 145 Request for Judicial Notice re #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6-10, #3 Exhibit 11-15, #4 Exhibit 16-20)(Related document(s) #144 ) (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 3/10/2017. Replies due by 3/16/2017. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 143 MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Deny Class Certification re #139 MOTION Expand Scope of Certified Collective Action and Issue Additional Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216(B) filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 3/15/2017. Replies due by 3/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Decker ISO Motion to Deny Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chris Decker, #3 Declaration of Kimberly Warren, #4 Exhibit A, B, and C to Declaration of Kimberly Warren, #5 Declaration of Larry Clark, #6 Exhibit A of Larry Clark, #7 Declaration of Chian Burks, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/1/2017) Modified on 3/2/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #140 Stipulation re: Briefing Schedule Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 27, 2017 Filing 141 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 2020 Companies LLC re #140 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed as Joint Stipulation of Plaintiffs and Defendant re Briefing Schedule for Motion to Deny Class Certification and Motion for Judgment of the Pleadings (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 27, 2017 Filing 140 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Briefing Schedule for Motion to Deny Class Certification and Motion for Judgment of the Pleadings filed by 2020 Companies LLC, Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation of Plaintiffs and Defendant Re Briefing Schedule for Motion to Deny Class Certification, and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 2/27/2017) Modified on 2/28/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2017 Filing 139 MOTION Expand Scope of Certified Collective Action and Issue Additional Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216(B) filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 3/10/2017. Replies due by 3/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expanded class notice form, #2 Exhibit Expanded class opt-in form, #3 Exhibit Proposed order re expanded class, #4 Exhibit Email re superior court, #5 Exhibit GrubHub denial of motion to stay, #6 Exhibit Conde Declaration, #7 Exhibit Conde Declaration, #8 Exhibit Moore, #9 Exhibit Order denying MTD, #10 Exhibit Oder granting 216(b) motion, #11 Exhibit Mutual Arb agreement)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for Failure to Appear at the Case Management Conference. Show Cause Response due by 3/10/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/22/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2017: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2017 Filing 137 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/21/2017. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2017 11:00 AM. Hearing on Plaintiffs' motion to expand the scope of the collective action and to send notice to additional individuals and Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s motion to deny Class Certification and motion for Judgment on the pleadings set for 3/30/2017 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. All motions shall be fully briefed by 3/16/2017. Parties shall file a stipulation and proposed Order regarding a shortened briefing schedule. Court shall issue an Order to Show Cause as to Defendants Larry Clark, Jerrimy Farris and Open Door Marketing, LLC. FTR Time 2:05-2:51. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/21/2017)
February 21, 2017 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance of Michael Freedman by Matthew David Carlson. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 2/21/2017) Modified on 2/21/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2017 Filing 135 CLERK'S NOTICE- Case Management Conference will be held in Courtroom 3 on the 3rd floor.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 14, 2017 Filing 134 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & Proposed Order filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Clark, Lisa Drake, Jerrimy Farris, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 2/14/2017) Modified on 2/15/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2017 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 20/20 Communications, Inc. re #132 Certificate of Interested Entities (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 14, 2017 Filing 132 Certificate of Interested Entities by 20/20 Communications, Inc. Amended Disclosure Statement in Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1 and N.D. L.R. 3-15 (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #130 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Wendy V. Miller, on 02/10/2017 (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017) Modified on 2/13/2017 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2017 Filing 130 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Wendy Miller ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11147237.) filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Good Standing)(Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #128 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #124 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
December 19, 2016 Filing 127 In light of the #126 Joint Status Update, the Court LIFTS THE STAY and SETS a Further Case Management Conference for 2/21/2017 at 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/19/2016. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 12, 2016 Filing 126 Joint Status Update by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings, 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 12/12/2016) Modified on 12/13/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Requiring Joint Status Update. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/5/2016. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
November 29, 2016 Filing 124 MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Open Door Marketing, LLC, Larry Clark, and Jerrimy Farris filed by Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2017 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 12/13/2016. Replies due by 12/20/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Sohn in Support of Motion to Withdraw, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jerrimy Farris in Support of Motion to Withdraw, #3 Declaration Declaration of Larry Clark in Support of Motion to Withdraw, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Sohn, David) (Filed on 11/29/2016) Modified on 11/30/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore re #113 Motion for Permission to Distribute Reminder Opt-In Notices. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 20, 2016 Filing 122 NOTICE of filing Opt In Consent Form by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 9/20/2016) Modified on 9/21/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2016 Filing 121 Letter to Court Re Objections to 32 Opt-In Consent Forms Filed on September 12, 2016. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 120 Letter from Harold L. Lichten re: Reminder Opt-In Notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE of filing Opt In Consent Forms by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 9/12/2016) Modified on 9/13/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2016 Filing 118 NOTICE of filing Opt In Consent Forms by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 9/12/2016) Modified on 9/13/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2016 Filing 117 NOTICE of filing Opt In Consent Forms by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 9/9/2016) Modified on 9/12/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2016 Filing 116 Defendants' Joint Opposition to #113 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Permission to Distribute Reminder Opt-In Notices filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 9/6/2016) Modified on 9/7/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER re #113 Emergency ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Permission to Distribute Reminder Opt-In Notices. The Court construes the motion as an administrative motion. Per Civil Local Rule 7-11, Defendants must file any response no later than 4 days after the motion has been filed, or the parties should stipulate to the appropriate notice. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/2/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
September 2, 2016 Filing 114 NOTICE of filing Opt In Consent Forms by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 9/2/2016) Modified on 9/6/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2016 Filing 113 Emergency ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION and [Proposed] Order for Permission to Distribute Reminder Opt-In Notices filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. Responses due by 9/6/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Reminder Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Jill Kahn in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Permission to Distribute Reminder Opt-In Notices)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 9/2/2016) Modified on 9/6/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2016 Filing 112 NOTICE of filing Opt In Consent Forms by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 8/30/2016) Modified on 8/31/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2016 Filing 111 NOTICE of filing Opt In Consent Forms by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 8/22/2016) Modified on 8/23/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2016 Filing 110 NOTICE of filing Opt In Consent Forms, filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 8/5/2016) Modified on 8/8/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2016 Filing 109 NOTICE of filing Opt In Consent Forms by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 7/29/2016) Modified on 8/1/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2016 Filing 108 NOTICE of Filing of Opt-In Consent Forms by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 7/25/2016) Modified on 7/26/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #104 Stipulation to Issue Notice and Stay Action. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 27, 2016 Filing 106 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Tamara Lange on 6/27/2016. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 27, 2016 Filing 105 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, set for June 28, 2016, is hereby vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 21, 2016 Filing 104 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER of the Parties to Issue Notice to Putative Class and Stay Action Pending Mediation filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Clarke, Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Jerrimy Farris, Shikwana Jennings, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Stipulation, #2 Exhibit B to Joint Stipulation, #3 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation of the Parties to Issue Notice to Putative Class and Stay Action Pending Mediation)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 6/21/2016) Modified on 6/22/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2016 Filing 103 Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding [Civil L.R. 3-13] by Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Sohn, David) (Filed on 6/13/2016) Modified on 6/14/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2016 Filing 102 Defendants Open Door Marketing, LLC, Jerrimy Farris, and Larry Clark's Answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Sohn, David) (Filed on 6/2/2016) Modified on 6/3/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2016 Filing 101 Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint as filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 6/2/2016) Modified on 6/3/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES RE: DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Shikwana Jennings, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC, Larry Clarke, Lisa Drake Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2016.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/27/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 99 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Clarke, Lisa Drake, Jerrimy Farris, Shikwana Jennings, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 5/26/2016) Modified on 5/27/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating as moot #49 Motion to Compel.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 12, 2016 Filing 97 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third) against 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. Filed byShikwana Jennings, Lisa Drake, Carlos Conde. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 12, 2016 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 5/19/216 at 10:30 AM Pacific is rescheduled to 6/27/2016 at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please use the call-in information previously provided. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re #95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 84 Clerk's Notice, JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by 2020 Companies LLC, 20/20 Communications, Inc., Shikwana Jennings, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC, Carlos Conde, Larry Clarke, Lisa Drake, Motions terminated: #95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 84 Clerk's Notice, JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by 2020 Companies LLC, 20/20 Communications, Inc., Shikwana Jennings, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC, Carlos Conde, Larry Clarke, Lisa Drake.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/10/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 10, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2016. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/7/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 95 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re 84 Clerk's Notice, JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Clarke, Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Jerrimy Farris, Shikwana Jennings, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 5/9/2016) Modified on 5/10/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2016 Filing 94 Plaintiff Carlos Conde's Post-Hearing Brief in Opposition to Defendant Open Door Marketing, LLC, Larry Clark, and Jerrimy Farris's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Carlos Conde. (Related document(s) #91 ) (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/29/2016) Modified on 5/2/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2016 Filing 93 Post-Hearing Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Related document(s) #91 ) (Sohn, David) (Filed on 4/22/2016) Modified on 4/25/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying #50 Motion to Dismiss based on forum non conveniens; granting #51 Motion to Dismiss; granting #53 Motion to Dismiss; granting #54 Motion to Compel; holding in abeyance #21 Motion to Certify Class. Third amended complaint due within 30 days. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REQUIRING POST-HEARING BRIEFS re #49 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC, Larry Clarke. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/12/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew David Carlson (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
March 24, 2016 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 3/24/2016 with Tamara Lange. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 5/19/2016 at 10:30 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Arguments heard, matters submitted. Court to issue order.Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2016. re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant 20 20 Communications, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Against 20/20 Communications, Inc., or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points an filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., #49 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC, Larry Clarke, #50 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Forum Non Conveniens and FRCP Rule 12(b)(3) filed by Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC, Larry Clarke, #54 MOTION to Compel Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitratoin and Motionto Dismiss or in the Alternative, Staty; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., #51 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(e) filed by Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC, Larry Clarke, #21 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Shikwana Jennings, Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake Total Time in Court 1 hour 8 minutes. Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/17/2016)
March 11, 2016 Filing 88 CLERK'S NOTICE- Motions hearings will be held in Courtroom 2 on the 4th floor.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 7, 2016 Filing 87 ERRATA RE: Plaintiffs' Proposed Court-Authorized Notice by Carlos Conde, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit corrected copy of proposed notice)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER TERMINATING AS MOOT #83 MOTION to Continue, #85 MOTION to Continue. See 84 and 2/22/16 ADR Remark. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 02/26/2016. ***This is a text-only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry.***(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 22, 2016 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on February 25, 2016 at 10:00 AM is rescheduled to March 24, 2015 at 11:30 AM. Any party may request an earlier ADR Phone Conference by contacting the ADR Unit at 415-522-2199. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 85 Defendants' Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher W. Decker in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference, #2 Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 2/19/2016) Modified on 2/22/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2016 Filing 84 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for March 1, 2016, is continued to May 24, 2016, at 1:30 p.m., 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by May 17, 2016. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 83 MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference to March 17, 2016 filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jill Kahn in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 2/19/2016) Modified on 2/22/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #81 Stipulation (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 12, 2016 Filing 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Declaration that California Law Applies to the Underlying Statutory Claims in this Case filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings, 20/20 Communications, Inc., Open Door Marketing, LLC, Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 2/12/2016) Modified on 2/16/2016 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2016 Filing 80 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Carlos Conde (Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 79 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Lisa Drake (Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 78 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Shikwana Jennings (Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating #66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Parties to prepare a stipulation and proposed order in light of Defendants' response to the motion.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 20/20 Communications, Inc. re #75 Response to Plaintiff' s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2016) Modified on 1/25/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2016 Filing 75 Defendant 20 20 Communications Inc., Open Door Marketing, Jerrimy Farris and Larry Clark's Response to #66 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service re Defendant 20 20 Communications Inc., Open Door Marketing, Jerrimy Farris and Larry Clark's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2016) Modified on 1/25/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2016 Filing 74 REPLY (re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Forum Non Conveniens and FRCP Rule 12(b)(3) ) filed byLarry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Larry Clark iso Defendants' Reply)(Sohn, David) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 73 REPLY (re #49 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(1) ) filed byLarry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Larry Clark iso Defendants' Reply, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jerrimy Farris iso Defendants' Reply)(Sohn, David) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 72 REPLY (re #51 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(e) ) filed byLarry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Sohn, David) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 71 REPLY (re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant 20 20 Communications, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Against 20/20 Communications, Inc., or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points an ) Defendant 20 20 Communication's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof re Defendant 20 20 Communication's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 70 REPLY (re #54 MOTION to Compel Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitratoin and Motionto Dismiss or in the Alternative, Staty; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Comepl Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying #67 Motion to Shorten Time.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing - Notice is hereby given that the following motions: #21 #49 #50 #51 #53 #54 , previously set for February 4, 2016, are continued to March 17, 2016, at 11:00 a.m., 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 11, 2016 Filing 67 MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Shorten Time for Hearing on Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 1/11/2016) Modified on 1/12/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION and [Proposed] Order for Partial Summary Judgment Seeking A Determination that California Law Applies to the Underlying Statutory Claims in this Case filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 1/22/2016. Replies due by 1/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit page from google maps, #2 Proposed Order)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 1/8/2016) Modified on 1/11/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2016 Filing 65 RESPONSE (re #51 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(e) ) filed byCarlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
January 7, 2016 Filing 64 RESPONSE (re #53 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Against 20/20 Communications, Inc., or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement) filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 1/7/2016) Modified on 1/8/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2016 Filing 63 RESPONSE (re #54 MOTION to Compel Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 1/7/2016) Modified on 1/8/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2016 Filing 62 RESPONSE (re #49 MOTION to Compel Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 1/7/2016) Modified on 1/7/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/8/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2016 Filing 61 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Shikwana Jennings, Lisa Drake, Carlos Conde. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 1/7/2016) Modified on 1/8/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 24, 2015 Filing 60 RESPONSE (re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Forum Non Conveniens and FRCP Rule 12(b)(3) ) filed byCarlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 12/24/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 59 REPLY (re #21 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byCarlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kahn Decl., #2 Exhibit Howard Decl., #3 Exhibit Merchant Decl., #4 Exhibit Jennings Decl., #5 Exhibit Conde Decl)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 58 NOTICE of Filing Opt-In Consent Forms by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt-In forms)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 12/21/2015) Modified on 12/22/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2015 Filing 57 Errata Re #52 Declaration of James Beugler in Support of Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Notice to be Issued to Similarly Situated Employees by 20/20 Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 12/8/2015) Modified on 12/9/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2015 Filing 56 RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION to Certify Class ) in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Notice to be Issued to Similarly Situated Employees Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed byLarry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Sohn, David) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 55 Declaration of Christopher W. Decker in Support of #54 MOTION to Compel Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitratoin and Motionto Dismiss or in the Alternative, Staty; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B to Declaration of Christopher W. Decker in Support of Defendant 20/20 Communicaitons, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbirtration, #2 Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 54 Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion and [Proposed] Order to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 12/21/2015. Replies due by 12/28/2015. (Attachments: #1 Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Claims, #2 Declaration of Kimberly Warren in Support of Defndant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #3 Declaration of Chian Burks in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motoin to Compel Arbitration)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 12/7/2015) Modified on 12/8/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/8/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2015 Filing 53 Defendant 20 20 Communications, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion and [Proposed] Order to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Against 20/20 Communications, Inc., or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc..Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 12/21/2015. Replies due by 12/28/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 12/7/2015) Modified on 12/8/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2015 Filing 52 RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION to Certify Class ) 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Notice to be Issued to Similarly Situated Employees Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. filed by20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chian Burks in Support of Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Notice to be Issued to Similarly Situated Employees, #2 Declaration of James Beugler in Support of Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Notice to be Issued to Similarly Situated Employees, #3 Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 51 MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(e) filed by Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 1/7/2016. Replies due by 1/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6))(Sohn, David) (Filed on 12/7/2015) Modified on 12/8/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2015 Filing 50 MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Dismiss Pursuant to Forum Non Conveniens and FRCP Rule 12(b)(3) filed by Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 1/7/2016. Replies due by 1/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Sohn iso Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Forum Non Conveniens and FRCP Rule 12(b)(3), #2 Declaration Declaration of Larry Clark iso Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Forum Non Conveniens and FRCP Rule 12(b)(3), #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Sohn, David) (Filed on 12/7/2015) Modified on 12/8/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 1/7/2016. Replies due by 1/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Sohn iso Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration Declaration of Larry Clark iso Motion to Compel Arbitration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Sohn, David) (Filed on 12/7/2015) Modified on 12/8/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2015 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC (Sohn, David) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 47 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Larry Clarke, Jerrimy Farris, Open Door Marketing, LLC.. (Sohn, David) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 46 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Jerrimy Farris (Sohn, David) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 45 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Larry Clark and Open Door Marketing, LLC (Sohn, David) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 2, 2015 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shikwana Jennings, Lisa Drake, Carlos Conde. Service waived by Jerrimy Farris waiver sent on 11/30/2015, answer due 1/29/2016. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
December 2, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on December 2, 2015 at 12:30 PM Pacific time is rescheduled to February 25, 2016 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #39 Stipulation re: leave to file second amended complaint and request to continue case management conference. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 30, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2016 01:30 PM. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 42 STIPULATION re #41 Errata, Joint Stipulation of the parties Re(1) Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, and (2) Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Clarke, Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Jerrimy Farris, Shikwana Jennings, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/30/2015) Modified on 12/1/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2015 Filing 41 ERRATA re #39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES RE (1) LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND (2) REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Notice of Errata re Joint Stipulation of the Parties Re (1) Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, and (2) Request to Continue Case Management Conference by 20/20 Communications, Inc.. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 40 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/9/2015. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 39 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER OF THE PARTIES RE (1) LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND (2) REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Clarke, Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Jerrimy Farris, Shikwana Jennings, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/24/2015) Modified on 11/25/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2015 Filing 38 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 19, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on December 1, 2015 at 2:30 PM Pacific time is rescheduled to December 2, 2015 at 12:30 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 37 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on December 1, 2015 at 2:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION and [Proposed] Order for Leave to File Second Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 11/16/2015) Modified on 11/17/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2015 Filing 34 EXHIBITS re #21 MOTION to Certify Class (Corrected Version of Exhibit C) filed byCarlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2 of Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit part 3 of Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 33 Notice of Withdrawal of Justin M. Scott as Counsel for Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc. by Christopher William Decker. (Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/6/2015) Modified on 11/9/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re unusable chambers copies re #21 MOTION for notice to similarly situated employees. Chambers copy due within 7 days. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/06/15. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER (AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT) GRANTING STIPULATION re (1) Service of the First Amended Complaint, and (2) Scheduling Matters; TERMINATING #17 MOTION to Dismiss. Second amended complaint due by 11/16/2015. Responsive pleading due 12/7/15. Responses to #21 motion for notice to similarly situated employees due by 12/7/2015; replies due by 12/21/2015. Motion Hearing continued to 2/4/2016 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/06/15. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (1) Service of the First Amended Complaint, and (2) Scheduling Matters, filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc., Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/5/2015) Modified on 11/6/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2015 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shikwana Jennings, Lisa Drake, Carlos Conde. Service waived by 20/20 Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 11/2/2015, answer due 1/4/2016. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 30, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2015 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to 20/20 Communications, Inc., Jerrimy Farris. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 27 Notice of Apperance of Counsel for Specially Appearing Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc. by Christopher William Decker. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Decker, Christopher) (Filed on 10/27/2015) Modified on 10/28/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2015 Filing 26 RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 4(A), 10(A), 12(B)(2), (4)-(6)] ) filed byCarlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2020 Companies Offer letter)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 25 Proposed Summons. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 24 Proposed Summons. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 23 AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against 20/20 Communications, Inc., Larry Clarke, Open Door Marketing, LLC, Jerrimy Farris. Filed by Shikwana Jennings, Lisa Drake, Carlos Conde. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 10/27/2015) Modified on 10/28/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2015 Filing 22 Renotice motion hearing re #21 MOTION to Certify Class filed byCarlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION for Notice to be Issued to Similarly Situated Employees Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 11/6/2015. Replies due by 11/13/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 10/23/2015) Modified on 10/26/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2015 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by 20/20 Communications, Inc... (Scott, Justin) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 19 Specially Appearing Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Disclosure Statement in Compliance With Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1 and N.D. L.R. 3-15 by 20/20 Communications, Inc. (Scott, Justin) (Filed on 10/13/2015) Modified on 10/14/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2015 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 7 days of this notice. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 17 MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 4(A), 10(A), 12(B)(2), (4)-(6)] filed by 20/20 Communications, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 10/27/2015. Replies due by 11/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chian Burks, Submitted in Support of Specially Appearing Defendant 20/20 Communications, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Scott, Justin) (Filed on 10/13/2015) Modified on 10/14/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2015 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint served on Larry Clark and Open Door Marketing, LLC on 9/25/2015, filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint served on Barry Millay and 2020 Companies, LLC on 9/22/2015, filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice Re: Jill Kahn. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 09/22/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015) Modified on 9/23/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Harold Lichten.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015) Modified on 9/23/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Jill Kahn (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 25NDGTJ3.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/16/2015 filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 9/22/2015) Modified on 9/23/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Harold Lichten (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 25NDGTBG.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/16/2015 filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 9/22/2015) Modified on 9/23/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Opt-In Consent Forms by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt-In Forms)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 9/21/2015) Modified on 9/22/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2015 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings.. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 17, 2015 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to 2020 Companies LLC, Larry Clarke, Barry Millay, Open Door Marketing, LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 17, 2015 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 17, 2015 Electronic filing error. Incomplete summons, this filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: #6 Proposed Summons filed by Shikwana Jennings, Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 16, 2015 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 16, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Jill Kahn (Filing fee $ 305.00 receipt number 0971-9838796) filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Kahn, Jill) (Filed on 9/16/2015) Modified on 9/17/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Harold Lichten (Filing fee $305.00, receipt number 0971-9838768) filed by Carlos Conde, Lisa Drake, Shikwana Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Lichten, Harold) (Filed on 9/16/2015) Modified on 9/17/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2015 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 8, 2015 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 8, 2015 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-9817465). Filed by Shikwana Jennings, Lisa Drake, Carlos Conde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Lisa Drake Opt-In Form, #3 Exhibit Carlos Conde Opt-In Form)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 9/8/2015) Modified on 9/8/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conde et al v. 2020 Companies LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Conde
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Represented By: Harold Lichten
Represented By: Jill Stephanie Kahn
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shikwana Jennings
Represented By: Harold Lichten
Represented By: Jill Stephanie Kahn
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Drake
Represented By: Harold Lichten
Represented By: Jill Stephanie Kahn
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2020 Companies LLC
Represented By: Christopher William Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open Door Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Alexandria Smith
Represented By: Michael Leslie Thompson
Represented By: David D. Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Millay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Dale Clark
Represented By: Kristin Alexandria Smith
Represented By: Michael Leslie Thompson
Represented By: David D. Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20/20 Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher William Decker
Represented By: Justin Michael Scott
Represented By: Wendy V. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrimy Farris
Represented By: Kristin Alexandria Smith
Represented By: Michael Leslie Thompson
Represented By: David D. Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?