Ryan v. Sandia Corporation

Plaintiff: Evelyn Ryan
Defendant: Sandia Corporation
Case Number: 4:2015cv04102
Filed: September 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting: 43 STIPULATION re Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Sandia Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/31/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 28, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016).
April 20, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING APRIL 21 HEARING. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
January 20, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 27 Case Management Statement filed by Evelyn Ryan Reset ting Deadlines as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/22/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset for 4/22/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/20/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
September 25, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granted 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE OF DEFENDANT'S CONTINUED MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Evelyn Ryan.Deadlines as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 1 2(b)(6), 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE OF DEFENDANT'S CONTINUED MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS. Responses due by 10/7/2105. Replies due by 10/14/2015. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/25/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. Sandia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Ryan
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Represented By: Jody Ilene LeWitter
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandia Corporation
Represented By: Rachel Jan Moroski
Represented By: Danielle L. Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?