Judy Ditchey v. Mechanics Bank et al

Plaintiff: Judy Ditchey
Defendant: Mechanics Bank and Mechanics Bank Change In Control Plan
Case Number: 4:2015cv04103
Filed: September 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Substitution of Counsel filed by Mechanics Bank Change In Control Plan, Mechanics Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/4/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
February 24, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
January 14, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: 22 30 : IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall produce relevant documents, including Change in Control Agreements for other key executives by 1/15/2016; Plaintiff shall file her Supplemental Brief by 1/25/2016; Defendants shall file their Response by 2/8/2016; and Plaintiff shall file her Reply by 2/15/2016. Signed by Judge Jacqueline S. Corley on 1/14/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 7, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 19 Motion to Dismiss (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judy Ditchey v. Mechanics Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mechanics Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mechanics Bank Change In Control Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Ditchey
Represented By: Daniel Mark Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?