Google Inc. v. Local Lighthouse Corp.

Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Defendant: Local Lighthouse Corp.
Case Number: 4:2015cv04219
Filed: September 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016) Modified on 7/15/2016 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 38 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
December 22, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2016.; Discovery due by 8/4/2016; Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2016 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial (5 day) set for 1/3/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/22/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 16, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear on December 22, 2015 in Lieu of Lead Trial Counsel (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
October 5, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. v. Local Lighthouse Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Karli Givner-Forbes
Represented By: Brendan Joseph Hughes
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Lighthouse Corp.
Represented By: Brian Mitchell Davis
Represented By: James George Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?