Davis et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: George Davis and Oxane "Gypsy" Taub
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and San Francisco Police Department
Case Number: 4:2015cv04336
Filed: September 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND SAN FRANCISCO POLICE DEPARTMENT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/7/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
September 25, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 6 preliminary relief. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 23, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Davis
Represented By: D. Gill Sperlein
Represented By: Lawrence G. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oxane "Gypsy" Taub
Represented By: D. Gill Sperlein
Represented By: Lawrence G. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?