Dogbo v. Verizon Wireless (VAW) LLC et al

Plaintiff: Nicaise Dogbo
Defendant: Verizon Wireless (VAW) LLC and Randstad Technologies, LP
Case Number: 4:2015cv04418
Filed: September 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2017 11:00 AM.(jswlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
April 27, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/27/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
September 30, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/30/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dogbo v. Verizon Wireless (VAW) LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicaise Dogbo
Represented By: Patrick A. Hormillosa
Represented By: Joseph Antonio Lepera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless (VAW) LLC
Represented By: Aaron L. Agenbroad
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randstad Technologies, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?