Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.126.99.126
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.126.99.126
Case Number: 4:2015cv04441
Filed: September 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup granting 142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 153 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 164 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS AND DEADLINES IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/6/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/28/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL by Judge Alsup denying 150 Motion to Continue; finding as moot 151 Ex Parte Application. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND CERTAIN DATES AND DEADLINES AND TO MODIFY THE ANONYMITY ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 135 Motion extend.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 REQUEST FOR E-FILER'S ATTESTATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/9/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ***REDACTED*** ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS re 121 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/23/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY HEARING, Motions terminated: 118 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Malibu Media, LLC.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/22/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/16/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AS TO EMPLOYMENT RECORDS by Hon. William Alsup granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY LETTERS, Motions terminated: 89 87 102 File Wrappers due by 12/26/2016. Creation Date Response due by 12/12/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/6/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE THIRD DISCOVERY LETTER AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO QUASH, Motions terminated: 97 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.126.99.126. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2016 12:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 77 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/10/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING MALIBU MEDIA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE FURTHER THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA by Hon. William Alsup denying 58 (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM by Hon. William Alsup denying 45 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 7/6/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/31/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM by Hon. William Alsup granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO QUASH, MOTIONS TO DISMISS, AND MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED PROCEDURE FOR EFFECTUATING SERVICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/29/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/5/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/25/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup granting 9 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.126.99.126
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Brenna Elsie Erlbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.126.99.126
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?