Neumann v. Foster Wheeler LLC

Plaintiff: Gunther Neumann
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv04521
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PARTIES DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/15/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 9, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 21 Notice (Other) filed by Gunther Neumann. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/9/2016. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 10, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT STATUS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/10/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
January 8, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 16 Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/8/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neumann v. Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gunther Neumann
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?