Brown v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation

Plaintiff: Joyce Loretta Brown
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Amtrak Corporation and MV Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv04647
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MEDIATION HEARING re 43 Proposed Order filed by Amtrak Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/2/16. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT & PRETRIAL ORDER. Jury Trial set for 2/13/2017 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2017 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/02/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 28, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS filed by Joyce Loretta Brown, Amtrak Corporation, Case referred to mediation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/28/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
February 26, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 26 Proposed Order to Appear telephonically filed by Amtrak Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/26/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 3, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 17 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 02/03/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 14, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Show Cause Response due by 1/19/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 01/14/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Loretta Brown
Represented By: Tim S. Hodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Mariel Covarrubias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrak Corporation
Represented By: Mariel Covarrubias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?