Kay v. Main Street Hub, Inc.
Plaintiff: Norman Kay
Defendant: Main Street Hub, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv04666
Filed: October 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Norman Kay. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/22/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER resetting status. Status Conference set for 8/4/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 7/28/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/4/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Stipulated Protective Order] filed by Main Street Hub, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Deadline For Mediation filed by Main Street Hub, Inc. Status Report due by 5/26/2016. Status Conference reset for 6/2/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/28/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Main Street Hub, Inc. filed by Main Street Hub, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/27/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kay v. Main Street Hub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Kay
Represented By: Frank P. Sarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Hub, Inc.
Represented By: Sheeva June Ghassemi-Vanni
Represented By: Daniel James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?