Blue v. Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Blue
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv04786
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION 31 (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 1, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE RECENTLY FILED STIPULATION Further Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/1/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
February 8, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
November 3, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
November 2, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/2/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue v. Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Blue
Represented By: Jared Hague
Represented By: Joseph Vidal Macias
Represented By: S. Brett Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Rea Boyce
Represented By: Rachael Sarah Lavi
Represented By: John Kevin Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?