Yousif v. San Mateo County Sheriff et al

Plaintiff: Osman Yousif
Defendant: San Mateo County Sheriff, San Mateo County Sheriff's Department Half Moon Bay Substation, Chris Laughlin, Daly City Area of San Mateo County Sheriff's Department and Redwood City Area of San Mateo County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 4:2015cv04887
Filed: October 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/23/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 22, 2017 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR SUBMISSION OF JOINT PROPOSED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 117 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
February 21, 2017 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CORRECT COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup denying 101 Motion to Amend/Correct ;.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 15, 2017 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISPUTED SEALING MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/15/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 1, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT LOUBAL, Motions terminated: 98 97 filed by Osman Yousif.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/1/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
January 25, 2017 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/25/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 17, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re 87 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Osman Yousif. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/17/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
November 29, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIES' STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR AN ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR NON-EXPERT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY by Hon. William Alsup granting 84 Stipulation. Close of Expert Discovery due by 1/13/2017. Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/13/2017.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 8, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 82 Administrative Motion To Relate.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
October 6, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY LETTER by Judge Alsup on 10/6/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
September 7, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/7/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
July 1, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST SHERIFF GREG MUNKS, DEPUTY CHRIS LAUGHLIN, OFFICER CHRIS ADAIR, COUNTY OF SAN MATEO, AND CITY OF MENLO PARK 58 59 . (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
May 5, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 37 38 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 26, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/26/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 5, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 46 DEFENDANTS STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE THE REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
March 28, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FAILURE TO FILE TIMELY OPPOSITIONS 41 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
February 29, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 19 20 23 MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 23, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Pleadings due by 2/26/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/23/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 17, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 PLAINTIFFS SECOND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 19, 2016.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 11, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 29 PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 2, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/2/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
December 7, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/21/2015.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/7/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 30, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/26/15. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yousif v. San Mateo County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osman Yousif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County Sheriff's Department Half Moon Bay Substation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daly City Area of San Mateo County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redwood City Area of San Mateo County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?