Hammons v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: William E. Hammons, II
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and NDEX West, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv04897
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 4, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 18 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016) Modified on 3/4/2016 (cl, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 6 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
October 26, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring case to ADR Unit for assessment telephone conference. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/26/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammons v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Hammons, II
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Viddell Lee Heard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?